Committees: H.R.65 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/04/2007 Referred to
04/18/2007 Hearings by
04/25/2007 Markup by
05/22/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-164
Senate Indian Affairs06/12/2007 Referred to
04/24/2008 Markup by
07/08/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-409