Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/07/2007