There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Non-Foreign AREA Act of 2008
Non-Foreign Area Retirement Equity Assurance Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for retirement equity for Federal employees in nonforeign areas outside the 48 contiguous States and the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/16/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
07/23/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/16/2008Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2008Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2008Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/16/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/29/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform07/16/2008 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia07/23/2008 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs07/16/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6516. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/16/2008)

Non-Foreign Area Retirement Equity Assurance Act of 2008 or the Non-Foreign AREA Act of 2008 - Revises federal employee locality-based comparability payments provisions to include U.S. territories and possessions, including the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, within a pay locality. Revises the calculation of allowances based on living costs and conditions of environment for pay of employees stationed outside the continental United States or in Alaska to apply it only to areas designated as of December 31, 2008. Provides a formula for adjustment of such rate using a transition schedule for calendar years 2009-2011.

Requires adjustment of special rates of pay in such areas in accordance with regulations prescribed by the Director of the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) or by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for VA personnel. Allows a temporarily raised limitation on the amount of special rates during the transition period.

Expresses the sense of Congress that application of this Act to an employee should not result in a decrease in take home pay.

Defines as covered employees for purposes of this Act those who are or will be eligible for a cost-of-living allowance (COLA).

Allows an employee subject to this Act's transition schedule and who retires from service during the period from January 1, 2009, through December 31, 2011, to elect to have the COLA paid during that period considered as basic pay for purposes of annuity computation.

Provides procedures for employees to make an irrevocable election to be covered by this Act.