Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/16/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/23/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/25/2008