There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Administrator of General Services to take certain actions with respect to parcels of real property located in Eastlake, Ohio, and Koochiching County, Minnesota, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/15/2008Became Public Law No: 110-427. (TXT | PDF)
10/15/2008Signed by President.
10/06/2008Presented to President.
09/30/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10185-10186)
09/22/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8532)
09/22/2008Committee on Armed Services discharged.
09/22/2008Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-866, Part I.
07/16/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/15/2008Became Public Law No: 110-427. (TXT | PDF)
10/15/2008Signed by President.
10/06/2008HousePresented to President.
10/01/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/30/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10185-10186)
09/23/2008SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/22/2008-3:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2008-3:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8532)
09/22/2008-3:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6524.
09/22/2008-3:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8532-8533)
09/22/2008-3:37pmHouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/22/2008HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
09/22/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 563.
09/22/2008HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-866, Part I.
08/04/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
07/31/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/31/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/31/2008HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
07/17/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/16/2008HouseReferred to House Armed Services
07/16/2008HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
07/16/2008HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/16/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/16/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/16/2008 Referred to
07/31/2008 Markup by
09/22/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-866
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management07/17/2008 Referred to
07/31/2008 Discharged from
House Armed Services07/16/2008 Referred to
09/22/2008 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness08/04/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6524.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6524. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-427 (10/15/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Authorizes the Administrator of the General Services Administration (GSA) to release certain restrictions in the deed for a parcel of land conveyed to the city of Eastlake, Ohio, (i.e., use of land only for recreational purposes) in exchange for $30,000.

Directs the Administrator to convey, through a quit claim deed, to Koochiching County, Minnesota, certain land located in International Falls, Minnesota, (formerly the site of the Koochiching Army Reserve Training Center) in exchange for $30,000.