Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/24/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/09/2008