Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/16/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/17/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/24/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/24/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/24/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/01/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/01/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 08/01/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/25/2008