There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1750 Lundy Avenue in San Jose, California, as the "Gordon N. Chan Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/21/2008Became Public Law No: 110-442. (TXT | PDF)
10/21/2008Signed by President.
10/10/2008Presented to President.
10/02/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10422)
09/27/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10209)
09/27/2008Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
07/21/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/21/2008Became Public Law No: 110-442. (TXT | PDF)
10/21/2008Signed by President.
10/10/2008HousePresented to President.
10/03/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/02/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10422)
09/29/2008SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/27/2008-3:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2008-3:34pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10209)
09/27/2008-3:34pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10209)
09/27/2008HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
09/27/2008-3:34pmHouseMr. Clay asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
07/21/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
07/21/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/21/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/21/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 07/21/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/09/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 09/09/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/09/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform07/21/2008 Referred to
09/27/2008 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.6558.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6558. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-442 (10/21/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1750 Lundy Avenue in San Jose, California, as the "Gordon N. Chan Post Office Building."