There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Hubbard Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Hubbard Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Hubbard Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Hubbard Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure the fair treatment of a member of the Armed Forces who is discharged from the Armed Forces, at the request of the member, pursuant to the Department of Defense policy permitting the early discharge of a member who is the only surviving child in a family in which the father or mother, or one or more siblings, served in the Armed Forces and, because of hazards incident to such service, was killed, died as a result of wounds, accident, or disease, is in a captured or missing in action status, or is permanently disabled, to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the dollar limitation on contributions to funeral trusts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
08/29/2008Became Public Law No: 110-317. (TXT | PDF)
08/29/2008Signed by President.
08/25/2008Presented to President.
08/01/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8004-8005)
07/29/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7276-7278)
07/23/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
09/04/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
08/29/2008Became Public Law No: 110-317. (TXT | PDF)
08/29/2008Signed by President.
08/25/2008HousePresented to President.
08/01/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8004-8005)
07/30/2008SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/29/2008-8:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2008-8:25pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7276-7278)
07/29/2008-8:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6580.
07/29/2008-8:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7276-7280)
07/29/2008-8:07pmHouseMr. Kind moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/23/2008HouseReferred to House Oversight and Government Reform
07/23/2008HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
07/23/2008HouseReferred to House Veterans' Affairs
07/23/2008HouseReferred to House Armed Services
07/23/2008HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/23/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services07/23/2008 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel09/04/2008 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs07/23/2008 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/23/2008 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform07/23/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6580. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-317 (08/29/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Hubbard Act - Amends federal employment, armed forces, military pay, and veterans' benefits law to authorize the provision of the following benefits to a member of the Armed Forces who is discharged at the member's request pursuant to a Department of Defense (DOD) policy permitting the early discharge of a member who is the only surviving child in a family in which the father or mother, or one or more siblings, served in the Armed Forces and, incident to such service, was killed, died as a result of wounds, accident, or disease, is in a captured or missing in action status, or is permanently disabled: (1) continued payment, through the original agreed-upon service period, of any bonus, incentive, or similar benefit to which the member was entitled during service; (2) separation pay, even though the member has completed less than six years of active service before discharge; (3) transitional health care, on the same basis as an active-duty member, for 180 days after discharge; (4) transitional commissary and exchange benefits, on the same basis as an active-duty member, for two years after discharge; (5) veterans' housing loan, employment and training, and basic educational assistance; (6) federal unemployment compensation; and (7) veteran's preference for federal employment purposes.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the limitation on contributions to funeral trusts.

Makes this Act effective with respect to any such discharge granted after September 11, 2001.