Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/31/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/31/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/11/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/16/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/17/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/18/2008