Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/30/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/31/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/31/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/31/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/01/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/08/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/08/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/09/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/24/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/24/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/24/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/24/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/02/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/02/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/02/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/02/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/09/2008