Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/31/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/31/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/31/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/31/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/31/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/31/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/01/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/01/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/08/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/08/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/08/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/09/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/09/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/09/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/09/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/09/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/10/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/10/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/10/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/15/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/15/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/15/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/22/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/22/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 09/22/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/24/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/24/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/24/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/24/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/25/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/25/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/25/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/25/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/25/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/25/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/25/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/25/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/25/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/26/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/03/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/19/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/19/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/09/2008