Committees: H.R.660 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/24/2007 Referred to
06/13/2007 Markup by
07/10/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-218
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/01/2007 Referred to
05/03/2007 Hearings by
06/07/2007 Markup by
06/07/2007 Reported by
House Ways and Means01/24/2007 Referred to
07/10/2007 Discharged from
House Oversight and Government Reform01/24/2007 Referred to
07/10/2007 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary08/03/2007 Referred to
12/17/2007 Discharged from