Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/29/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/29/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/19/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/20/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/27/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/16/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/16/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/23/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/01/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/26/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/26/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/07/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/14/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/15/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/07/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/15/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/24/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/25/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/02/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/19/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/19/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/09/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew