Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/29/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/29/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/29/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/29/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/29/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 08/01/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/23/2008