Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/06/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/06/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/16/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/28/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/09/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/09/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/09/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/22/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/22/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007