Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/30/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/30/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/30/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/31/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/31/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/08/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/10/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/16/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/16/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/17/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/22/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/24/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/25/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/02/2008