Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/10/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/10/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/10/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/10/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/11/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/16/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/24/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/24/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/24/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/24/2008