Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/07/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/09/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/15/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/15/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/17/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/22/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2007