Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/30/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/30/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/27/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/27/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/05/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/10/2008