Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/15/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/18/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/23/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/23/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/26/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/02/2008