Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 08/01/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/16/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/26/2008