There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States National Health Insurance Act (or the Expanded and Improved Medicare for All Act)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for comprehensive health insurance coverage for all United States residents, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/24/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
02/02/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/30/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/24/2007Referred to House Natural Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2007Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2007Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2007Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (93)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/29/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/29/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/29/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/29/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/07/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/21/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/30/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/13/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/17/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/20/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/20/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/01/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/09/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/22/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/18/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/29/2008

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/24/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/02/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/24/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health01/30/2007 Referred to
House Natural Resources01/24/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.676.


Subjects (120)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.676. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2007)

United States National Health Insurance Act (or the Expanded and Improved Medicare for All Act) - Establishes the United States National Health Insurance (USNHI) Program (the Program) to provide all individuals residing in the United States and in U.S. territories with free health care that includes all medically necessary care, such as primary care and prevention, prescription drugs, emergency care, and mental health services.

Prohibits an institution from participating in the Program unless it is a public or nonprofit institution. Allows nonprofit health maintenance organizations (HMOs) that actually deliver care in their own facilities to participate in the Program.

Gives patients the freedom to choose from participating physicians and institutions.

Prohibits a private health insurer from selling health insurance coverage that duplicates the benefits provided under this Act. Allows such insurers to sell benefits that are not medically necessary, such as cosmetic surgery benefits.

Sets forth methods to pay hospitals and health professionals for services. Prohibits financial incentives between HMOs and physicians based on utilization.

Establishes the USNHI Trust Fund to finance the Program with amounts deposited: (1) from existing sources of Government revenues for health care; (2) by increasing personal income taxes on the top 5% income earners; (3) by instituting a progressive excise tax on payroll and self-employment income; and (4) by instituting a small tax on stock and bond transactions.

Requires the Program to give first priority in retraining and job placement and unemployment benefits to individuals whose jobs are eliminated due to reduced administration.

Establishes a National Board of Universal Quality and Access to provide advice on quality, access, and affordability.

Provides for the eventual integration of the Indian Health Service into the Program.