Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/29/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/29/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/29/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/29/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/07/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/27/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/21/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/30/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/13/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/17/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/20/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/20/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/01/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/09/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/22/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/18/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/29/2008