Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/31/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/01/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/09/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/09/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/09/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/15/2008