There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Security Language Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To strengthen the national security through the expansion and improvement of foreign language study, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
05/18/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
01/24/2007Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2007Referred to House Intelligence (Permanent)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2007Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2007Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/24/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/30/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/08/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/13/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2008

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor01/24/2007 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness05/18/2007 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)01/24/2007 Referred to
House Armed Services01/24/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.678.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.678. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/24/2007)

National Security Language Act - Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 (HEA) to establish programs to encourage early foreign language instruction, including grants to: (1) partnerships of institutions of higher education (IHEs) and local educational agencies (LEAs) for activities relating to foreign language instruction at elementary or secondary schools, with priorities for high-need LEAs and less-commonly taught foreign languages; and (2) IHEs that develop innovative programs for the teaching of foreign languages, with priorities for combining foreign languages with science and technology and for less-commonly taught foreign languages.

Provides undergraduate student loan forgiveness of up to $10,000 for students who major in a critical foreign language and are employed as teachers of such language in elementary or secondary schools or as using such language regularly in a federal agency.

Directs the Secretary of Education to: (1) establish a foreign language education marketing campaign to encourage students at secondary schools and IHEs to study foreign languages, particularly ones less commonly taught and critical to national security; and (2) conduct a study to identify foreign language heritage communities and recruit speakers of such critical languages.

Amends the David L. Boren National Security Education Act of 1991 to establish an International Flagship Language Initiative with grants to IHEs.