Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/30/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/08/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/13/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/13/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/18/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2008