Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/23/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/23/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/24/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/26/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/26/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/03/2008