Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/08/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/02/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/03/2008