Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/15/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/17/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/22/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/26/2008