Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/13/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-398.
10/13/2008 Signed by President.
10/03/2008 Presented to President.
09/29/2008 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H10623-10625)
09/29/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/24/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9319)
09/24/2008 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 110-881.
09/09/2008 Introduced in House