Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/09/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/19/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/19/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 04/19/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/19/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/07/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/29/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/29/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/29/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/06/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/07/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/12/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/25/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/12/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/22/2008