Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/10/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/15/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/18/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/28/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/28/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/28/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/28/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/29/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/03/2008