Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/08/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/08/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/13/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/28/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/28/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/08/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/08/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/23/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/23/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/03/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/23/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/16/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/03/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2008