Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/15/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/15/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/16/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/16/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/16/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/16/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/17/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/17/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/18/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/18/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/18/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/22/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/22/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/22/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/22/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/22/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/23/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/24/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/24/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/24/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/24/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/24/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/25/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/25/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/25/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/25/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/25/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/25/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/26/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/26/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/26/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/26/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/26/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/26/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/26/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/27/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/29/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/29/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/29/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/29/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/29/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/29/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/02/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/02/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/02/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/03/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/20/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/20/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/09/2008