Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/24/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/07/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/07/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/07/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/13/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/13/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/15/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/15/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/28/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/28/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/31/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/27/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/09/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/27/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/27/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/27/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/27/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/04/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/04/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/15/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/04/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/04/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/25/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/31/2008