Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/08/2008