Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/24/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/31/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/31/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/07/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/07/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/07/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/07/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/15/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/27/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/27/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/08/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/08/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/08/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/12/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/22/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/29/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/17/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/11/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/11/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/11/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/18/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/18/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/18/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/20/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/20/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/27/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/16/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/06/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/14/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/25/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/17/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/22/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/28/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/09/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/15/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/16/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/16/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/16/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/21/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/21/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/21/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/21/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/23/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/23/2008