Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/14/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/14/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/14/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/14/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/14/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/14/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/14/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/15/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/18/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/18/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/18/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/18/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/10/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/10/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/10/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/10/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/10/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/10/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/10/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/10/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/10/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/10/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/10/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/31/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/31/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/31/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 08/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/24/2008