Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/15/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/21/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/23/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/27/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 08/03/2007