Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/24/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/29/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/29/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/29/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/29/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/12/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/14/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/15/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/15/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/27/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/05/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/09/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/15/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/15/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/15/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/21/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/28/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/17/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/25/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/01/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/16/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/16/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/23/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/23/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/06/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/12/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/18/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/10/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/12/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/16/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/16/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/16/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/07/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/10/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/25/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 11/05/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/08/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew