Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 09/18/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/18/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/18/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/18/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/23/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/23/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/24/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/24/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/25/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/26/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/26/2008