Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/18/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/24/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/2008