Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/29/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 01/29/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/31/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/08/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/14/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/14/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/15/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/15/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/15/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/05/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/05/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/07/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/07/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/13/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/13/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/13/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/13/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/13/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/13/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/15/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/15/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/20/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/20/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/20/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/20/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/20/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/20/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/23/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/18/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/18/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/18/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/18/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/24/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/24/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/25/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/25/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/30/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/30/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/30/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/01/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/01/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/01/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/02/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/02/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/08/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/08/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2007