There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Inmate Tax Fraud Prevention Act of 2008

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Inmate Tax Fraud Prevention Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

Inmate Tax Fraud Prevention Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permit the Secretary of the Treasury to disclose certain prisoner return information to the Federal Bureau of Prisons, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permit the Secretary of the Treasury to disclose certain prisoner return information to the Federal Bureau of Prisons.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
10/15/2008Became Public Law No: 110-428. (TXT | PDF)
10/15/2008Signed by President.
10/06/2008Presented to President.
10/02/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10405)
09/27/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10199)
09/25/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/15/2008Became Public Law No: 110-428. (TXT | PDF)
10/15/2008Signed by President.
10/06/2008HousePresented to President.
10/02/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/02/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10405)
09/29/2008SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/27/2008-2:58pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2008-2:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2008-2:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10199)
09/27/2008-2:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7082.
09/27/2008-2:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10199-10200)
09/27/2008-2:50pmHouseMr. Lewis (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
09/25/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/25/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/25/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.7082.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.7082. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-428 (10/15/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on September 27, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Inmate Tax Fraud Prevention Act of 2008 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to authorize the Secretary of the Treasury to disclose to the head of the Federal Bureau of Prisons tax return information of prisoners whom the Secretary has determined may have filed or facilitated the filing of a false tax return. Prohibits the head of the Federal Bureau of Prisons from disclosing any prisoner tax return information to any person other than an officer or employee of such Bureau. Restricts the use of such tax return information to preventing the filing of false and fraudulent tax returns. Terminates such disclosure authority after December 31, 2011. Imposes recordkeeping and reporting requirements on the Bureau with respect to disclosures of prisoner tax return information.

Requires the Secretary to submit an annual report to Congress on the filing of false and fraudulent tax returns by federal and state prisoners and to make such reports available to the public.

Requires the Treasury Inspector General for Tax Administration to submit a written report to Congress by December 31, 2010, on the implementation of the authority to disclose prisoner tax return information.

Amends the federal judicial code with respect to certain widows and widowers whose judicial survivors' annuities are terminated on account of remarriage before age 55. Requires restoration of such benefits, at the same rate, upon the dissolution of the remarriage by death, divorce, or annulment, if specified requirements are met.