Refine your search

6 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
10/16/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-435.
10/16/2008 Signed by President.
10/07/2008 Presented to President.
09/30/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10186)
09/27/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10278-10279)
09/25/2008 Introduced in House