Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/29/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/07/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/07/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/07/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/07/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/07/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/12/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/12/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/12/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/12/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/12/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/12/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/13/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/06/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/06/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/06/2007