Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/05/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/05/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/05/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/13/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/13/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/13/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/15/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/15/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/27/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/27/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/06/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/06/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/08/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/08/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/08/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/14/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/26/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/26/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/29/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/24/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/25/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/25/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/07/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/16/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/05/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/14/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/01/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/26/2008