Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/06/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/06/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/06/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/06/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/08/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/13/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/05/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/05/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/05/2007