There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Timber Tax Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow a deduction for qualified timber gains.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/30/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/30/2007Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/30/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/30/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/30/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/30/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/06/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/08/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/08/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/15/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/15/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/15/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/15/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/15/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/15/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/15/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/06/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/06/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/14/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/14/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/14/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/09/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/30/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.721. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2007)

Timber Tax Act of 2007 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a tax deduction (available to taxpayers whether or not they itemize deductions) for up to 60% of gains from certain sales or exchanges of timber.